+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On September 14, 1998 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Bereuter moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
On July 22, 1998 in the House:
- Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 24, 1998 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 9, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa.
On April 29, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on International Relations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor