+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On October 17, 1989 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking.
On October 3, 1989 in the Senate:
- Ordered held at the desk until the close of business October 6, 1989.
On September 29, 1989 in the Senate:
- Held at the desk by unanimous consent. Until the close of business October 3, 1989.
On September 28, 1989 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On September 28, 1989 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Mr. Gonzalez asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs discharged.
- Referred to the House Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor