+ − Summary
+ − Actions (16)
On October 12, 1990 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 101-417.
- Signed by President.
On October 3, 1990 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 2, 1990 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 1, 1990 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 1, 1990 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On March 8, 1990 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On March 7, 1990 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
- Mr. Sawyer asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
On September 9, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On September 6, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor