+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On October 25, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8191-8192)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 359.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8191-8194)
- Ms. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
On July 27, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and North Africa.
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (59)
Type:
Primary Sponsor