+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On December 12, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9824)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 336.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9824-9826)
- Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
On November 15, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor