+ − Actions (8)
On March 3, 1982 in the House:
- Clean Bill to be Reported in Lieu.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 2, 1982 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 4, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 2, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Accounts.
On January 28, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on House Administration.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor