+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
On November 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On November 17, 2010 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 327 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Ms. Watson moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
On September 29, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor