+ − Actions (10)
On July 22, 1982 in the House:
- Resolution Agreed to in House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House as Privileged Matter.
On April 28, 1982 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar No: 105.
- Reported to House by House Committee on House Administration. Report No: 97-493.
On March 23, 1982 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 3, 1982 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On January 27, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Contracts and Printing.
On January 25, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on House Administration.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor