+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 27, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 0 (Roll no. 540). (text: CR 9/25/2017 H7444)
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7552-7553)
On September 25, 2017 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 311.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7444-7446)
- Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
On July 27, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific.
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor