+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On October 12, 1988 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 7, 1988 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On October 5, 1988 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On October 5, 1988 in the House:
- Resolution Agreed to in House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On September 29, 1988 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Health and the Environment Discharged.
On September 20, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
On March 31, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor