+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 269 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Ms. Brown, Corrine moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 42.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-79 .
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Discharged.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor