+ − Summary
+ − Actions (8)
On June 13, 1988 in the House:
- Resolution Agreed to in House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On May 24, 1988 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 27, 1988 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 5, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Employment Opportunities.
On September 14, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Education and Labor.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor