+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On December 7, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 419 - 8 (Roll no. 667). (text: CR 12/5/2017 CR H9659-9660)
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9730-9731)
On December 5, 2017 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 259.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9659-9663)
- Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
On July 27, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended).
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor