+ − Actions (22)
On June 30, 1982 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 97-209.
- Signed by President.
On June 25, 1982 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On June 24, 1982 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On June 21, 1982 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On June 21, 1982 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On June 16, 1982 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 672.
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Baker for Senator Percy without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
On June 15, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 5, 1982 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On May 4, 1982 in the House:
- House Committee on Foreign Affairs Discharged by Suspension of Rules.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
On April 1, 1982 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 3, 1982 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 1, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
On December 7, 1981 in the House:
- Favorable Executive Comment Received From State.
On August 4, 1981 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State.
On April 15, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
On April 9, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor