+ − Actions (7)
On November 17, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 2, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On October 16, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On October 2, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On September 25, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On September 17, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Legislative Process.
On September 15, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Rules.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor