+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2417)
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2332)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 21.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2332-2333)
- Mr. Barletta moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 22.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-86.
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor