+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 11, 1995 in the House:
- For Further Action See H.J.Res.73 .
On March 29, 1995 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On March 28, 1995 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On March 6, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 27.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 104-67 .
On February 28, 1995 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported Without Recommendation by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 14.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On January 4, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor