+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On December 7, 2020 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6869-6870)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 189.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6869-6872)
- Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture Discharged.
On October 30, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (155)
Type:
Primary Sponsor