+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On November 25, 1991 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 23, 1991 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On November 22, 1991 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 351.
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Pell without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On November 20, 1991 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On November 19, 1991 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Mr. Owens moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
On October 31, 1991 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
On October 30, 1991 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received from State.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
On August 12, 1991 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State.
On August 2, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
On July 25, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor