+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On August 3, 1983 in the House:
- Resolution Agreed to in House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House as Privileged Matter.
On July 27, 1983 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar No: 81.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Public Works and Transportation. Report No: 98-323.
On June 23, 1983 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 7, 1983 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 6, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Investigations and Oversight.
On May 23, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Water Resources.
On May 3, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor