+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 18, 1989 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 101-15.
- Signed by President.
On April 11, 1989 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On April 10, 1989 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On April 7, 1989 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On April 7, 1989 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On April 6, 1989 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 41.
On April 5, 1989 in the House:
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Mr. Sawyer asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- H.AMDT.9 Amendments offered by Mr. Sawyer. Amendments changed the text and title to include the years 1989 and 1990.
- H.AMDT.9 On agreeing to the Sawyer amendment Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On March 9, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On March 7, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.9
Amendments changed the text and title to include the years 1989 and 1990.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor