+ − Summary
+ − Actions (16)
On May 9, 1983 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Executive Comment Received From State. May 9, 83 Executive Comment
On May 5, 1983 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Intelligence . Report No: 98-88 .
- Ordered to be Reported.
On May 4, 1983 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Armed Services. Report No: 98-88 .
On May 3, 1983 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 2, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From State. May 2, 83 Executive Comment
On April 28, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from White House.
On April 27, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From State.
On April 26, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Investigations.
On April 14, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from White House.
On April 13, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Armed Services.
- Referred to House Committee on Intelligence .
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor