+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1013-1014)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 148.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1013-1015)
- Ms. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and North Africa.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor