+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 22, 1988 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On April 20, 1988 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- H.AMDT.613 Amendment Passed in Committee of the Whole by Voice Vote.
- H.AMDT.613 Amendment Offered by Representative Dymally. An amendment that designates the week beginning April 17, 1988 as World Population Awareness Week.
On February 18, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On February 11, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.613
An amendment that designates the week beginning April 17, 1988 as World Population Awareness Week.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor