+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and an amended preamble by Yea-Nay Vote. 97-0.
- S.AMDT.3562 Amendment SP 3562 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- Amendment SP 3562 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.3562 Proposed by Senator Thomas. In the nature of a substitute for the resolution and the preamble.
- Amendment SP 3562 proposed by Senator Thomas.
- Measure laid before Senate.
On March 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On March 19, 1996 in the House:
- Mr. Gilman moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- DEBATE - The House resumed debate.
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Solomon objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote : 369 - 14, 7 Present .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
On March 14, 1996 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 13, 1996 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 12, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific.
On March 11, 1996 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State.
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on International Relations.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.3562
In the nature of a substitute for the resolution and the preamble.
+ − Vote
March 19, 1996: Suspend the Rules and Agree, as amended
- Yeas: 369
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 41
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor