+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On July 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5187)
On July 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On July 12, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H4695-4696)
- Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4695-4696)
- Mr. Royce asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
On July 7, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor