+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On July 27, 2010 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1401 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Costello moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
On July 15, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 218.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-543 .
On July 1, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Aviation Discharged.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 27, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
On May 26, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor