+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 26, 1987 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On February 24, 1987 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- H.AMDT.6 Amendment Agreed to by House .
- H.AMDT.6 Amendment Offered by Representative Dymally. An amendment to move the date of the commemoration to February 16, 1988.
On February 11, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On February 3, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.6
An amendment to move the date of the commemoration to February 16, 1988.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor