+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Pursuant to section 6 of H. Res. 330, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 367; H.R. 370; H.R. 396; H.R. 397, as amended; H.R. 408; H.R. 490; H.R. 965, as amended; H.R. 1251, as amended; H.R. 1395; H.R. 1491; H.R. 1528; H.R. 1532; H.R. 1565; H.R. 1602; and H.R. 2523, as amended; and the following resolution was agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 124, as amended. (consideration: CR H1979-1994; text: CR H1992-1993)
- Passed/agreed to in House: Pursuant to section 6 of H. Res. 330, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 367; H.R. 370; H.R. 396; H.R. 397, as amended; H.R. 408; H.R. 490; H.R. 965, as amended; H.R. 1251, as amended; H.R. 1395; H.R. 1491; H.R. 1528; H.R. 1532; H.R. 1565; H.R. 1602; and H.R. 2523, as amended; and the following resolution was agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 124, as amended.(consideration: CR H1979-1994; text: CR H1992-1993)
- Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 330, proceedings on H. Res. 124 are considered vacated.
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 124.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1934-1937; text: CR H1934-1936)
- Mr. Meeks moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Energy, the Environment and Cyber.
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor