+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On May 4, 1987 in the House:
- Resolution Agreed to in House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House as Privileged Matter.
- House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On April 21, 1987 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 30, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
On March 24, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On March 17, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor