+ − Summary
+ − Actions (6)
On May 2, 1984 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 10, 1984 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 15, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD, State, Arms Control & Disarm Agcy.
On November 10, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 4, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Security and Scientific Affairs.
On February 2, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor