+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On October 18, 1978 in the Senate:
- Public Law 95-482.
- Signed by President.
On October 17, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
On October 14, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- House agreed to Senate amendments.
On October 14, 1978 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Measure enrolled in House.
On October 14, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On October 11, 1978 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Appropriations with amendment, S. Rept. 95-1317.
On September 28, 1978 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations.
On September 26, 1978 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #838 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On September 21, 1978 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Appropriations with amendment, H. Rept. 95-1599.
On September 19, 1978 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Appropriations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor