+ − Summary
+ − Actions (6)
On June 19, 1986 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 12, 1986 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 4, 1986 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 26, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Fossil and Synthetic Fuels.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Energy Conservation and Power.
On January 3, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor