+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On December 4, 2010 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 111-290.
- Signed by President.
On December 3, 2010 in the House:
- Presented to President.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 2, 2010 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On December 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On December 1, 2010 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 101 .
- Rule H. Res. 1741 passed House.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1741 .
- Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 101 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. All points of order against consideration of the joint resolution are waived except those arising under clause 9 or 10 of rule XXI. All points of order against provisions in the joint resolution are waived.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.J. Res. 101 , the Chair put the question on adoption of the resolution and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Lewis demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on adoption of the resolution until later in the legislative day.
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 239 - 178 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On December 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On November 30, 2010 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1741 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 101 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. All points of order against consideration of the joint resolution are waived except those arising under clause 9 or 10 of rule XXI. All points of order against provisions in the joint resolution are waived.
- Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor