+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On October 16, 1973 in the House:
- Public law 93-124.
- Signed by President.
On October 12, 1973 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
- Cleared for White House
On October 12, 1973 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report, roll call #469 .
On October 11, 1973 in the House:
- House agreed to conference report, roll call #516 .
- Motion to recommit conference report failed of passage in House, roll call #515 .
On October 10, 1973 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-566.
On October 9, 1973 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On October 3, 1973 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
- Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #459 .
On October 1, 1973 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Appropriations with amendment, S. Rept. 93-411.
On September 25, 1973 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #479 .
On September 25, 1973 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations.
On September 20, 1973 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Appropriations, H. Rept. 93-519.
On September 18, 1973 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Appropriations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor