+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On November 8, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 106-90.
On October 27, 1999 in the House:
- Presented to President.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 26, 1999 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On October 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 339.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch without amendment. Without written report.
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On September 24, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Constitution, Federalism, Property.
On September 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On September 21, 1999 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Gekas moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.J. Res. 62 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On September 8, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 182.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 106-304 .
On August 3, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 29, 1999 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 23, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law.
On July 22, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor