+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On October 18, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-502.
- Signed by President.
On October 7, 1988 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 6, 1988 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On September 20, 1988 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 16, 1988 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On September 16, 1988 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On September 14, 1988 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 935.
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Pell without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported in lieu of S.J.RES. 347 without amendment favorably.
On August 10, 1988 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On August 8, 1988 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On August 3, 1988 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations Discharged.
On July 28, 1988 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
On July 13, 1988 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State.
On July 11, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Asian and Pacific Affairs.
On June 30, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor