+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On November 6, 1986 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 99-611.
- Signed by President.
On October 30, 1986 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 29, 1986 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 18, 1986 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 18, 1986 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On October 10, 1986 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On October 10, 1986 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- H.AMDT.1296 Amendment Passed in Committee of the Whole by Unanimous Consent.
- H.AMDT.1296 Amendment Offered by Representative Garcia. An amendment that changes the designated date to May 3, 1987.
On April 22, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On April 10, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.1296
An amendment that changes the designated date to May 3, 1987.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor