+ − Summary
+ − Actions (15)
On September 19, 1980 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-353.
- Signed by President.
- Measure presented to President.
On September 18, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On September 18, 1980 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On September 17, 1980 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On September 17, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On September 16, 1980 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary .
On September 8, 1980 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
On September 3, 1980 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged in House.
On August 18, 1980 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor