+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 86.
On June 17, 1997 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 419 - 0 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Pappas moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution.
On June 11, 1997 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 28, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Civil Service.
On February 26, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform and Oversight.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor