+ − Summary
+ − Actions (16)
On June 4, 1980 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-261.
- Signed by President.
On June 3, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On June 3, 1980 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
- Cleared for White House.
On June 3, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, roll call #171 .
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
On May 30, 1980 in the House:
- Measure passed House, roll call #280 .
- Motion to recommit to Committee on Appropriations rejected in House, roll call #279 .
- Motion to postpone further consideration tabled in House, roll call #277 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by special rule in House.
On May 29, 1980 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Appropriations, H. Rept. 96-1054.
On May 28, 1980 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Appropriations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor