+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On October 19, 1984 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 98-536.
- Signed by President.
On October 11, 1984 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 10, 1984 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 4, 1984 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 4, 1984 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On September 29, 1984 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 1293.
- Committee on Rules. Reported to Senate by Senator Mathias without amendment. With written report No. 98-645.
On September 26, 1984 in the Senate:
- Committee on Rules. Ordered to be reported in lieu of S.J.RES. 281 without amendment favorably.
On September 19, 1984 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules.
On September 17, 1984 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On September 13, 1984 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar No: 257.
- Reported to House by House Committee on House Administration. Report No: 98-1013.
On September 12, 1984 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 24, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on House Administration.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor