+ − Actions (7)
On August 18, 1982 in the House:
- See H.J.Res.350 .
On May 19, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 5, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 19, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 18, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 17, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Monopolies and Commercial Law.
On January 5, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor