+ − Summary
+ − Actions (17)
On October 23, 1992 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 102-470.
- Signed by President.
On October 19, 1992 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 13, 1992 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 8, 1992 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 8, 1992 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On October 5, 1992 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 801.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
On October 2, 1992 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On September 17, 1992 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On September 16, 1992 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Mr. Sawyer asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
On July 8, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On June 30, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor