+ − Summary
+ − Actions (14)
On September 30, 1992 in the House:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Failed by the Yeas and Nays: : 88 - 283 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
On September 22, 1992 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed until Sept. 23.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Rostenkowski moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution.
On September 16, 1992 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 497.
- Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 102-870.
On July 29, 1992 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported.
On July 23, 1992 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 22, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor