+ − Summary
+ − Actions (15)
On September 21, 1984 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 98-413.
- Signed by President.
On September 20, 1984 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On September 19, 1984 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On September 17, 1984 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On September 17, 1984 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On September 13, 1984 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 1172.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On August 9, 1984 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On August 8, 1984 in the House:
- Passed House by Unanimous Consent.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On March 7, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On March 6, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor