+ − Summary
+ − Actions (16)
On July 23, 1992 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On July 23, 1992 in the House:
- See H.J.Res.263 .
On July 21, 1992 in the House:
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 258 - 135 .
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to sections 152 and 153 of the Trade Act of 1974.
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 514 , the House proceeded with one hour of debate.
- Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 502 and H.R. 5318 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. All points of order against consideration of the measures shall be waived. After disposition of the joint resolution, it shall be in order to consider in the House the bill H.R. 5318 . The bill shall be debatable for one hour. The previous question shall be considered as ordered on the amendments recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means now printed in the bill, which shall be considered en bloc and not subject to a demand for a division, and on the bill without intervening motion except one motion to recommit.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 514 .
On July 9, 1992 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 514 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 502 and H.R. 5318 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. All points of order against consideration of the measures shall be waived. After disposition of the joint resolution, it shall be in order to consider in the House the bill H.R. 5318 . The bill shall be debatable for one hour. The previous question shall be considered as ordered on the amendments recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means now printed in the bill, which shall be considered en bloc and not subject to a demand for a division, and on the bill without intervening motion except one motion to recommit.
On June 30, 1992 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 349.
- Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 102-632.
On June 24, 1992 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported Without Recommendation by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 23, 1992 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee Unfavorably.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 5, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor