+ − Summary
+ − Actions (15)
On December 7, 1979 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-136.
- Signed by President.
- Measure presented to President.
On December 6, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On December 5, 1979 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On December 4, 1979 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On December 4, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary .
On November 29, 1979 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
On November 29, 1979 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged in House.
On November 20, 1979 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor