+ − Summary
+ − Actions (11)
On November 3, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-592.
- Signed by President.
On November 1, 1988 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 28, 1988 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 21, 1988 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 21, 1988 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On October 21, 1988 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On February 10, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On February 2, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor