+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 29, 2007 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 110-91.
- Signed by President.
On September 28, 2007 in the House:
- Presented to President.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 27, 2007 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On September 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 42.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On September 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Star Print ordered on the report.
On September 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 384.
- Committee on Finance. Reported by Senator Baucus without amendment. With written report No. 110-184 .
On September 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee on Finance. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On May 17, 2007 in the House:
- Pursuant to the provisions of S. Con. Res. 21 , H.J. Res. 43 is considered passed House.